NY A00459 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that a person convicted of loitering for the purpose of engaging in prostitution, a person convicted of prostitution, or a person whose participation in the offense is determined by a court to be a result of having been a victim of sex trafficking is excluded from the definition of designated offender.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specifies that a person convicted of loitering for the purpose of engaging in prostitution, a person convicted of prostitution, or a person whose participation in the offense is determined by a court to be a result of having been a victim of sex trafficking is excluded from the definition of designated offender.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2019-04-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-04-09Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.147
2019-03-18Assemblyreported
2019-03-14Assemblyprint number 459a
2019-03-14Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S03370 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - PRINT NUMBER 3370A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback