NY A00460 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-16 - signed chap.258
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-16 - signed chap.258
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adoption by a petitioner where such petitioner's parentage is legally-recognized.
Title
Relates to adoption by a petitioner where such petitioner's parentage is legally-recognized.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Didi Barrett [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] |
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Robert Carroll [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-16 | Senate | signed chap.258 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-03-28 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-28 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.351 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3999 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.13 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03999 (Same As) 2019-09-16 - signed chap.258