NY A00467 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to reporting requirements for various classifications of gas leaks by utility corporations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to reporting requirements for various classifications of gas leaks by utility corporations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatetabled
2018-12-07Senatevetoed memo.267
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-13SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-13Senate3RD READING CAL.1756
2018-06-13SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4264A
2018-04-18SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2018-04-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-04-18Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-16Assemblyamended on third reading 467a
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.41
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-03-29SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2017-03-29Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-03-29Assemblypassed assembly
2017-03-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.87
2017-03-01Assemblyreported
2017-02-07Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-01-09Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S04264 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A467A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00467&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00467&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00467
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00467&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00467A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00467&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00467&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00467&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A467#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback