NY A00486 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - amended on third reading 486b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to securing payment of wages for work already performed; creates a lien remedy for all employees; provides grounds for attachment; relates to procedures where employees may hold shareholders of non-publicly traded corporations personally liable for wage theft; relates to rights for victims of wage theft to hold the ten members with the largest ownership interests in a company personally liable for wage theft.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to securing payment of wages for work already performed; creates a lien remedy for all employees; provides grounds for attachment; relates to procedures where employees may hold shareholders of non-publicly traded corporations personally liable for wage theft; relates to rights for victims of wage theft to hold the ten members with the largest ownership interests in a company personally liable for wage theft.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13Assemblyamended on third reading 486b
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.372
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-16Assemblyprint number 486a
2019-05-16Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-03-19Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S02844 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - referred to codes

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00486&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00486&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00486
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00486&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00486A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00486&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00486B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00486&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00486&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback