NY A00558 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the age to purchase tobacco products from 18 years old to 21 years old.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the age to purchase tobacco products from 18 years old to 21 years old.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-01Senate3RD READING CAL.343
2019-04-01SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2833
2019-03-06SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2019-03-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-06Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-05Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.36
2019-03-05Assemblyrules report cal.36
2019-03-05Assemblyreported
2019-03-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-03-02Assemblyprint number 558a
2019-03-02Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to codes
2019-02-28Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S02833 (Same As) 2019-04-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A558A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00558&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00558&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00558
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00558&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00558A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00558&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00558&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00558&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00558&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A558#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback