NY A00569 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that when a local social services district is in contact with a relative or non-relative kinship caregiver or a suitable person who the district has approached about being a kinship caregiver, such district shall provide written information to such caregivers or prospective suitable persons; further provides that such information shall include, but not be limited to, information relating to child only grants; information about how to become a kinship foster parent and other options for care; and information on how to contact the department of family assistance kinship programs and any resources funded through or operating in the local social services district for relative and non-relative kinship caregivers, including those that provide supportive services for all relative and non-relative kinship caregivers in the district.
Title
Provides that when a local social services district is in contact with a relative or non-relative kinship caregiver or a suitable person who the district has approached about being a kinship caregiver, such district shall provide written information to such caregivers or prospective suitable persons; further provides that such information shall include, but not be limited to, information relating to child only grants; information about how to become a kinship foster parent and other options for care; and information on how to contact the department of family assistance kinship programs and any resources funded through or operating in the local social services district for relative and non-relative kinship caregivers, including those that provide supportive services for all relative and non-relative kinship caregivers in the district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Children And Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Children And Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.399 |
2019-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-11 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-03-11 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.98 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | substituted for a569 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | referred to children and families |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.135 |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | substituted by s2714 |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.98 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S02714 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.399