NY A00574 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the retention of any amount of payment due and owing for materials delivered and accepted for a public or private construction project.
Title
Prohibits the retention of any amount of payment due and owing for materials delivered and accepted for a public or private construction project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.26 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.318 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.318 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05498 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE