NY A00591 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - signed chap.576
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - signed chap.576
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services to commission a statewide evaluation regarding the extent of gambling by New York state residents.
Title
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services to commission a statewide evaluation regarding the extent of gambling by New York state residents.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Maritza Davila [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] |
Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | signed chap.576 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1567 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5703 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.319 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.319 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S05703 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - signed chap.576