NY A00612 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the commissioner of health to establish and publish a list of generic drug products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the commissioner of health to establish and publish a list of generic drug products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-03-21Assemblyprint number 612a
2019-03-21Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S02391 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - PRINT NUMBER 2391A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback