NY A00636 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to pass-through manufacturers zero percent tax rate.
Title
Relates to pass-through manufacturers zero percent tax rate.
Sponsors
Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] | Asm. Robin Schimminger [D] | Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] |
Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Monica Wallace [D] | Asm. Brian Manktelow [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-12-30 | Assembly | print number 636b |
2019-12-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | print number 636a |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S01596 (Same As) 2019-01-23 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S04671 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
S04671 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE