NY A00652 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - starred on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - starred on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the operation of a motor vehicle by deaf or hard of hearing drivers; provides that no deaf or hard of hearing driver shall be required to wear a hearing aid while operating a motor vehicle provided that their vehicle is equipped with a full view mirror.
Title
Relates to the operation of a motor vehicle by deaf or hard of hearing drivers; provides that no deaf or hard of hearing driver shall be required to wear a hearing aid while operating a motor vehicle provided that their vehicle is equipped with a full view mirror.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | starred on calendar |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-14 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2020-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.30 |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.174 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |