NY A00670 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires blanket health insurance policies to provide coverage for outpatient treatment by mental health practitioners (mental health counsellors, marriage and family therapists, creative arts therapists and psychoanalysts) licensed pursuant to article 163 of the education law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires blanket health insurance policies to provide coverage for outpatient treatment by mental health practitioners (mental health counsellors, marriage and family therapists, creative arts therapists and psychoanalysts) licensed pursuant to article 163 of the education law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1786
2019-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6212A
2019-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.320
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.320
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-07Assemblyprint number 670a
2019-06-07Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2019-05-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S00886 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
S06212 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A670A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00670&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00670&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00670
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00670&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00670A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00670&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00670&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00670&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00670&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00670&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A670#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback