NY A00675 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - print number 675d
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Limits robocalls to state residents and requires telephone service providers to offer free call mitigation technology to telephone customers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits robocalls to state residents and requires telephone service providers to offer free call mitigation technology to telephone customers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11Assemblyprint number 675d
2019-06-11Assemblyamend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-06-04Assemblyprint number 675c
2019-06-04Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-05-15Assemblyprint number 675b
2019-05-15Assemblyamend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-03-12Assemblyprint number 675a
2019-03-12Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S03297 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00675&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00675&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00675
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00675&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00675A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00675&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00675B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00675&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00675C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00675&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00675D

Bill Comments

feedback