NY A00676 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.397
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.397
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the housing part of the civil court of the city of New York on its own motion or on the motion of a party to join the department of social services of the city of New York as a party in any action or proceeding wherein the failure of a recipient of or applicant for public assistance to pay rent is at issue; also permits the court to join the division of adult protective services of the city of New York, where appropriate.
Title
Authorizes the housing part of the civil court of the city of New York on its own motion or on the motion of a party to join the department of social services of the city of New York as a party in any action or proceeding wherein the failure of a recipient of or applicant for public assistance to pay rent is at issue; also permits the court to join the division of adult protective services of the city of New York, where appropriate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.397 |
2019-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.219 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a676 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.698 |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s2326 |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.219 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02326 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.397