NY A00677 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the collection of certain demographic information by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Title
Requires the collection of certain demographic information by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-06 | Senate | vetoed memo.172 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1244 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3662 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.49 |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03662 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - tabled