NY A00680 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-07 - print number 680b
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-07 - print number 680b
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the NY privacy act to require companies to disclose their methods of de-identifying personal information, to place special safeguards around data sharing and to allow consumers to obtain the names of all entities with whom their information is shared.
Title
Enacts the NY privacy act to require companies to disclose their methods of de-identifying personal information, to place special safeguards around data sharing and to allow consumers to obtain the names of all entities with whom their information is shared.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Dan Quart [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-07 | Assembly | print number 680b |
2022-01-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | print number 680a |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S06701 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - PRINT NUMBER 6701B