NY A00692 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the council for treatment equity within the office of alcoholism and substance abuse.
Title
Establishes the council for treatment equity within the office of alcoholism and substance abuse.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] | Asm. Maritza Davila [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S05440 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES