NY A00694 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-17 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to provide an optional pilot program for the cities of Buffalo, Rochester, Syracuse and Troy, and Albany to establish arts-based districts in their cities. The districts will be a benefit to citizens by promoting artistic activities and creating jobs causing revitalization and generating economic development in four major Upstate Cities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redes Art 16 & S16.01 to be Art 17 & S17.01, add Art 16 SS16.01 - 16.07, Arts & Cul L; add S411, RPT L; amd S1115, Tax L Provides an optional pilot program to establish arts-based districts in the cities of Buffalo, Rochester, Syracuse and Troy and for the repeal of the provisions pertaining thereto.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-17 reported referred to ways and means
2010-01-06 referred to tourism, arts and sports development
2009-05-04 print number 694a
2009-05-04 amend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2009-04-29 reported referred to ways and means
2009-01-07 referred to tourism, arts and sports development

Same As/Similar To

S3496-A (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback