NY A00694 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-04 - ordered to third reading cal.49
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "personal healthcare information privacy act"; prohibits interviews of other party's treating physicians or health care providers in personal injury, medical, dental, or podiatric malpractice or wrongful death actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "personal healthcare information privacy act"; prohibits interviews of other party's treating physicians or health care providers in personal injury, medical, dental, or podiatric malpractice or wrongful death actions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-01-04Assemblyordered to third reading cal.49
2012-01-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-01-04SenateDIED IN SENATE
2011-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2011-06-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2011-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2011-05-26Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.438
2011-05-24Assemblyreported
2011-04-28Assemblyprint number 694a
2011-04-28Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to codes
2011-01-05Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S03296 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback