NY A00710 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.233
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the closure of nursing homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the closure of nursing homes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.233
2019-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.233
2019-06-13Assemblyreported
2019-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-02-20Assemblyprint number 710a
2019-02-20Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-01-28Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-23Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S04861 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - PRINT NUMBER 4861A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00710&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00710&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00710
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00710&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00710A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00710&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00710&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00710&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00710&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4

Bill Comments

feedback