NY A00713 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes electronic cigarettes in the regulation of tobacco products; relates to the distribution and transportation of such products.
Title
Includes electronic cigarettes in the regulation of tobacco products; relates to the distribution and transportation of such products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | print number 713a |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03905 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES