NY A00714 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring gas corporations to file annual gas safety reports.
Title
Relates to requiring gas corporations to file annual gas safety reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-03-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-03-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 714a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.36 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-04-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.126 |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S01683 (Same As) 2020-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 1683A