NY A00719 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires suspension of a driver's license for a period of 60 days when a driver is convicted of passing a stopped school bus twice in 18 months.
Title
Requires suspension of a driver's license for a period of 60 days when a driver is convicted of passing a stopped school bus twice in 18 months.
Sponsors
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-04-27 | Assembly | print number 719a |
2018-04-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S01064 (Same As) 2018-05-14 - referred to transportation