NY A00745 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to criminal mischief in the third degree and criminal mischief in the second degree.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to criminal mischief in the third degree and criminal mischief in the second degree.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.14
2019-01-28Assemblyreported
2019-01-10Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S04321 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback