NY A00748 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the assignment of counsel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the assignment of counsel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-13Senate3RD READING CAL.1005
2019-06-13SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3672
2019-02-04SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2019-02-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-02-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.16
2019-01-28Assemblyreported
2019-01-10Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S03672 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A748

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback