NY A00760 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - print number 760a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - print number 760a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of education to conduct a study regarding the assistance needed to encourage women and minorities to pursue technology careers in science, technology, engineering and mathematics (STEM).
Title
Directs the commissioner of education to conduct a study regarding the assistance needed to encourage women and minorities to pursue technology careers in science, technology, engineering and mathematics (STEM).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Assembly | print number 760a |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S08727 (Same As) 2020-07-10 - REFERRED TO RULES