NY A00762 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - committed to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - committed to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Seeks to comply with the federal equal pay act of 1963 by implementing a state policy of compensating employees in state service equally for work of comparable value by eliminating wage inequality in job titles having been segregated by sex, race or national origin; requires the president of the civil service commission to report annually to the legislature and the governor on those segregated titles for which wage disparity exists; mandates governor to appropriate monies to ensure wage disparities are corrected.
Title
Seeks to comply with the federal equal pay act of 1963 by implementing a state policy of compensating employees in state service equally for work of comparable value by eliminating wage inequality in job titles having been segregated by sex, race or national origin; requires the president of the civil service commission to report annually to the legislature and the governor on those segregated titles for which wage disparity exists; mandates governor to appropriate monies to ensure wage disparities are corrected.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | committed to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S00838 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS