NY A00774 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - signed chap.2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - signed chap.2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to voter pre-registration and education on voter pre-registration.
Title
Relates to voter pre-registration and education on voter pre-registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | signed chap.2 |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-01-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.6 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1100 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.3 |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.3 |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01100 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - signed chap.2