NY A00794 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - RECOMMITTED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the offenses of rape in the first, second and third degrees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the offenses of rape in the first, second and third degrees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateRECOMMITTED TO CODES
2019-05-06Senatereturned to senate
2019-05-06Assemblyrepassed assembly
2019-05-01Assemblyamended on third reading 794c
2019-05-01Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2019-05-01AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-01Senaterecalled from senate
2019-04-09SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2019-04-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-04-09Assemblypassed assembly
2019-04-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.55
2019-04-09Assemblyrules report cal.55
2019-04-09Assemblyreported
2019-04-09Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-04-04Assemblyprint number 794b
2019-04-04Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-02-15Assemblyprint number 794a
2019-02-15Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-01-11Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S02938 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00794&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00794&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00794
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00794&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00794A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00794&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00794B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00794&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00794C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00794&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00794&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00794&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback