NY A00808 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s2746
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s2746
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of local cost data when adjusting claims; requires an insurer and independent adjuster to adjust certain claims made under an insurance policy that provides coverage for loss of or damage to property using cost data appropriate for the region of this state where the loss or damage occurred.
Title
Relates to the use of local cost data when adjusting claims; requires an insurer and independent adjuster to adjust certain claims made under an insurance policy that provides coverage for loss of or damage to property using cost data appropriate for the region of this state where the loss or damage occurred.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s2746 |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.59 |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.89 |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S02746 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.16