NY A00833 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment of a program for the use of medication assisted treatment for inmates in both state and county correctional facilities; reporting requirements; substance use disorder treatment and transition services implemented in jails.
Title
Relates to the establishment of a program for the use of medication assisted treatment for inmates in both state and county correctional facilities; reporting requirements; substance use disorder treatment and transition services implemented in jails.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.465 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.540 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a833b |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2161B |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2161A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-14 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.600 |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.41 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s2161b |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.540 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.540 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | print number 833b |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | print number 833a |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S02161 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES