NY A00838 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends a chapter of the laws of 2018 relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide job and vocational skills training to youth who have been adjudicated juvenile delinquents or juvenile offenders residing in a facility overseen by the office of children and family services, in relation to making certain provisions permanent; and providing for the repeal of provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Title
Amends a chapter of the laws of 2018 relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide job and vocational skills training to youth who have been adjudicated juvenile delinquents or juvenile offenders residing in a facility overseen by the office of children and family services, in relation to making certain provisions permanent; and providing for the repeal of provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] |
Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.193 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-25 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-03-25 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-25 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.148 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | substituted for a838 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | referred to children and families |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.11 |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | substituted by s1191 |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.148 |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S01191 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.193