NY A00842 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - approval memo.25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - approval memo.25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the time needed by small businesses and local governments to comply with new regulations.
Title
Relates to the time needed by small businesses and local governments to comply with new regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | approval memo.25 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | signed chap.577 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1400 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5812 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.474 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05812 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - approval memo.25