NY A00849 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-15 - print number 849d
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits settlement agreements in any claim involving sexual harassment or any other form of discrimination prohibited by law from containing any condition that requires the complainant to pay the defendant liquidated damages in the event that the plaintiff violates any nondisclosure agreement included in such settlement agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits settlement agreements in any claim involving sexual harassment or any other form of discrimination prohibited by law from containing any condition that requires the complainant to pay the defendant liquidated damages in the event that the plaintiff violates any nondisclosure agreement included in such settlement agreement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-15Assemblyprint number 849d
2020-07-15Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to judiciary
2020-04-29Assemblyprint number 849c
2020-04-29Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2019-05-28Assemblyprint number 849b
2019-05-28Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2019-01-23Assemblyprint number 849a
2019-01-23Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to judiciary
2019-01-11Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S05469 (Same As) 2020-07-15 - PRINT NUMBER 5469B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00849&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00849&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00849
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00849&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00849A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00849&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00849B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00849&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00849C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00849&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00849D

Bill Comments

feedback