NY A00852 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes restrictions on consumer and employment contracts.
Title
Establishes restrictions on consumer and employment contracts.
Sponsors
Asm. Aravella Simotas [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] |
Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Tremaine Wright [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.42 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.378 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02817 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY