NY A00860 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the commissioner of education an office appointed by the governor.
Title
Makes the commissioner of education an office appointed by the governor.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Kolb [R] | Asm. Gary Finch [R] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] |
Asm. Michael Montesano [R] | Asm. Joseph Giglio [R] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] | Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Assembly | held for consideration in education |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | referred to education |