NY A00861 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-19 - amend and recommit to rules 861a
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-19 - amend and recommit to rules 861a
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the judge shall not prohibit a parent from undergoing gender reassignment.
Title
Provides that the judge shall not prohibit a parent from undergoing gender reassignment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 861a |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00432 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - referred to judiciary