NY A00862 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 82-9)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - print number 862b
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - print number 862b
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the clean fuel standard of 2022; provides such standard is intended to reduce carbon intensity from the on-road transportation sector by 20% by 2030, with further reductions to be implemented based upon advances in technology.
Title
Establishes the clean fuel standard of 2022; provides such standard is intended to reduce carbon intensity from the on-road transportation sector by 20% by 2030, with further reductions to be implemented based upon advances in technology.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Assembly | print number 862b |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | print number 862a |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S02962 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES