NY A00867 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - substituted by s1806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - substituted by s1806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to a limited license for clinical laboratory technology.
Title
Extends provisions relating to a limited license for clinical laboratory technology.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | Assembly | substituted by s1806 |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.57 |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01806 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.151