NY A00880 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates sporting license fees for honorably discharged, disabled veterans.
Title
Eliminates sporting license fees for honorably discharged, disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Kolb [R] | Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
Asm. Andrew Garbarino [R] | Asm. Brian Manktelow [R] | Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in environmental conservation |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | print number 880a |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00268 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION