NY A00882 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - substituted by s1379
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to significant programmatic accomplishment for limited credit time allowances for certain inmates; now includes completion of an associate's, bachelor's or master's degree.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to significant programmatic accomplishment for limited credit time allowances for certain inmates; now includes completion of an associate's, bachelor's or master's degree.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20Assemblysubstituted by s1379
2019-05-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.321
2019-05-14Assemblyreported
2019-01-28Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to correction

Same As/Similar To

S01379 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback