NY A00887 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - substituted by s244b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - substituted by s244b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to human trafficking awareness and training; requires employees of lodging facilities to have training in the recognition of a human trafficking victim; requires the division of criminal justice services, the office of temporary and disability assistance and the New York state interagency task force on human trafficking to approve a human trafficking recognition training program.
Title
Relates to human trafficking awareness and training; requires employees of lodging facilities to have training in the recognition of a human trafficking victim; requires the division of criminal justice services, the office of temporary and disability assistance and the New York state interagency task force on human trafficking to approve a human trafficking recognition training program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Assembly | substituted by s244b |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.174 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.174 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 887c |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | print number 887b |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | print number 887a |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S00244 (Same As) 2022-07-20 - SIGNED CHAP.393