NY A00898 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-18)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - approval memo.23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-18)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - approval memo.23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to support orders for adult dependents; provides that a person who would otherwise be chargeable under law with support of a minor child is also chargeable with the support of any such individual until such individual reaches the age of 26, when it appears to the satisfaction of the court that such person is developmentally disabled as defined in section 1.03 of the mental hygiene law.
Title
Relates to support orders for adult dependents; provides that a person who would otherwise be chargeable under law with support of a minor child is also chargeable with the support of any such individual until such individual reaches the age of 26, when it appears to the satisfaction of the court that such person is developmentally disabled as defined in section 1.03 of the mental hygiene law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Assembly | approval memo.23 |
2021-10-08 | Assembly | signed chap.437 |
2021-09-29 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1638 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4467B |
2021-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.524 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.524 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 898b |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | print number 898a |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04467 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A898B