NY A00923 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - amended on third reading 923a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - amended on third reading 923a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the idling of any passenger vehicle, with certain exceptions, for more than 3 consecutive minutes; first violation is a warning, subsequent violations of such section are traffic infractions punishable by a fine of $150.
Title
Prohibits the idling of any passenger vehicle, with certain exceptions, for more than 3 consecutive minutes; first violation is a warning, subsequent violations of such section are traffic infractions punishable by a fine of $150.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Assembly | amended on third reading 923a |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.64 |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.369 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S01502 (Same As) 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 1502A