NY A00950 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - advanced to third reading cal.175
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the constitution to allow a person who will be 18 years old at the time of a presidential election to vote in the presidential primary election if he or she is 17 years of age at the time of the presidential primary election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends the constitution to allow a person who will be 18 years old at the time of a presidential election to vote in the presidential primary election if he or she is 17 years of age at the time of the presidential primary election.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.175
2019-04-08Assemblyreported
2019-03-12Assemblyreported referred to judiciary
2019-02-06Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2019-01-15Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S03822 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback