NY A00961 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-12 - amended on third reading 961a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-12 - amended on third reading 961a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to video gaming machines and disposition of revenues.
Title
Relates to video gaming machines and disposition of revenues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 961a |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.45 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.202 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.202 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05930 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 5930A