NY A00972 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting insurance companies from imposing co-payments for treatment at an opioid treatment program.
Title
Relates to prohibiting insurance companies from imposing co-payments for treatment at an opioid treatment program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.46 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.92 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.92 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | print number 972a |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S04643 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE