NY A01011 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-5)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-17 - substituted by s933a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-17 - substituted by s933a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the retail sale, distribution or offer to sell at retail to any person in the state, novelty lighters; provides definition of novelty lighters; establishes civil penalties; makes certain exceptions; provides no person is subject to a civil penalty for any violation occurring before the 90th day after enactment.
Title
Prohibits the retail sale, distribution or offer to sell at retail to any person in the state, novelty lighters; provides definition of novelty lighters; establishes civil penalties; makes certain exceptions; provides no person is subject to a civil penalty for any violation occurring before the 90th day after enactment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s933a |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.203 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.203 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 1011a |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-01-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S00933 (Same As) 2013-09-27 - SIGNED CHAP.359