NY A01024 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.633
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.633
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain law enforcement officers and firefighters to possess and administer epinephrine by use of an epinephrine auto-injector device.
Title
Authorizes certain law enforcement officers and firefighters to possess and administer epinephrine by use of an epinephrine auto-injector device.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Melissa Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.633 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.19 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a1024b |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3247B |
2019-06-11 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-10 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3247A |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.146 |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s3247b |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1024b |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1024a |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-13 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.19 |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03247 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.633