NY A01027 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - print number 1027b
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - print number 1027b
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allergy awareness and training in restaurants; requires allergen awareness training; certification within thirty days after hire date.
Title
Relates to allergy awareness and training in restaurants; requires allergen awareness training; certification within thirty days after hire date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-17 | Assembly | print number 1027b |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | print number 1027a |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05681 (Same As) 2020-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5681B